22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
14.11.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
12.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
07.12.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
05.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.10.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.06.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.08.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.03.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
11.03.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] |
21.01.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
21.01.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
03.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
23.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
02.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|