Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6608104 | 19.08.2003 | B2 | US2002019534 | 14.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81805601 | 27.03.2001 | US19296300 | 29.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3645825B | Global Dossier | 11.05.2005 | B2 | JP2001316383 | 13.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US19296300 | 29.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1138680 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19296300 | 29.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0101241 | 26.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US19296300 | 29.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2342271 | 14.11.2006 | C | CA2342271 | 29.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19296300 | 29.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA01003247 | 08.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US19296300 | 29.03.2000 |