EP1138680 - Gem substituted sulfonyl hydroxamic acids as MMP inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noe, Mark Carl, Pfizer Global Research & Developm. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer Limited, Patents Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302436.9 | 16.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | US20000192963P | 29.03.2000 Original published format: US 192963 P | [2001/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1138680 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D309/14, C07D405/12, A61K31/35, A61P19/02, A61P35/00 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
C07D309/10 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gem substituierte Sulfonylhydroxamsäuren mit MMP inhibierender Wirkung | [2001/40] | English: | Gem substituted sulfonyl hydroxamic acids as MMP inhibitors | [2001/40] | French: | Acides gem-substitués alpha-sulfonylamino hydroxamiques comme inhibiteurs de métalloprotease | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Request for further processing for: | 12.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9633172 (PFIZER [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]WO9720824 (AGOURON PHARMA [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]EP0780386 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [YD]WO9834918 (PFIZER [US], et al) [YD] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]WO9839315 (MONSANTO CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]WO9850348 (AGOURON PHARMA [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]WO9952889 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]WO9958531 (DU PONT PHARM CO [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]WO0009492 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [Y]WO0009485 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column W *; | [PX]WO0038718 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-12 * column W *; | [PX]WO0038717 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-12 * column W *; | [PX]EP1081137 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [PX] 1-12* column W *; | [Y] - MICHAELIDES M R ET AL, "RECENT ADVANCES IN MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITORS RESEARCH", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN,BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, SCHIPHOL,NL, (1999), vol. 5, ISSN 1381-6128, pages 787 - 819, XP000983775 [Y] 1-12 * column W * | [Y] - ABBRUZZESE,T.A. ET AL., "Matrix metalloproteinase inhibition limits arterial enlargement in a rodent arteriovenous fistula model", SURGERY, (199808), vol. 124, no. 2, pages 328 - 3335, XP001007326 [Y] 1-12 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/msy.1998.91338 | [Y] - WHITTAKER,M. ET AL., "Design and Therapeutic Application of Matrix Metalloprteinase Inhibitors", CHEM.REV., WASHINGTON, (1999), vol. 99, pages 2735 - 2776, XP002172816 [Y] 1-12 * column W * |