EP1182366 - Screw threaded members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ward, Michael E. 2022 Wellington Ct. Geneva, Illinois 60134 / US | 02 /
Siegenthaler, John H. 506 Ohio Street Darlington, Wisconsin 53530 / US | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2002/09] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306887.9 | 14.08.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | US20000227483P | 24.08.2000 Original published format: US 227483 P | US20010880562 | 13.06.2001 Original published format: US 880562 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1182366 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16B35/00 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
F16B33/02 (EP,US);
F16B35/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/46] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bauteile mit Schraubgewinde | [2002/09] | English: | Screw threaded members | [2002/09] | French: | Eléments avec filetage | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4334815 (KNOHL RUDOLPH E) [A] 1,7,9,17,18 * abstract * * figure 3 * * column 2, line 31 - line 47 *; | [A]US4237948 (HALL JOHN L [GB], et al) [A] 1,7,9,17,18 * abstract * * figure 5 * * column 1, line 15 - line 34 * * claims 1-8 *; | [A]JPH1151026 ; | [A]US5000638 (ESSOM CHARLES J [GB], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11051026 A 19990223 (MEIDOO:KK) [A] 7-18 * abstract * |