Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
31.12.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.12.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.10.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
05.10.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
13.07.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
11.06.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
14.05.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
05.12.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.09.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
22.03.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] |