EP1247142 - ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PHOTOCONDUCTORS COMPRISING POLYARYL ETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 740 West New Circle Road Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. Interllectual Property Law Dept., 740 West New Circle Road Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRINIVASAN, Kasturi, R. 740 Bluegrass Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01901892.8 | 09.01.2001 | [2002/41] | WO2001US00612 | Priority number, date | US20000480026 | 10.01.2000 Original published format: US 480026 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0151995 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1247142 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/02, C08G14/00, C08G65/48, C08L71/12 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
G03G5/075 (EP,US);
G03G5/0542 (EP,US);
G03G5/0564 (EP,US);
G03G5/0567 (EP,US);
G03G5/0575 (EP,US);
G03G5/0612 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHE PHOTOLEITER MIT POLYARYLETHER | [2002/41] | English: | ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PHOTOCONDUCTORS COMPRISING POLYARYL ETHERS | [2002/41] | French: | PHOTOCONDUCTEURS ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUES COMPRENANT DES ETHERS DE POLYARYLE | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6370256 ; | [A]JPS63239454 ; | [A]JPS63247757 ; | [A]EP0501455 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-41 * page 7; examples I-1-I-6 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 19, Database accession no. 1988-128574, XP002378010 & JPS6370256 A 19880330 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-41 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890131), vol. 013, no. 043, Database accession no. (P - 821), & JP63239454 A 19881005 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-41 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890209), vol. 013, no. 057, Database accession no. (P - 825), & JP63247757 A 19881014 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-41 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4728561 (CROCKER CHRISTOPHER [GB]); | [A]US4970284 (STANILAND PHILIP A [GB]); | [A]US4861856 (DARNELL W RONALD [US], et al) |