|
19.10.2005 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.09.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2004 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
122 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
99 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Supplemental sheet D (claims incurring fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2002 |
Communication about possibility to obtain an European search report after lack of unity of the international application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.07.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.07.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.09.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.09.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.09.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
05.09.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
30.08.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
189 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.04.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
26 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
147 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
15 |