EP1226160 - NOVEL ANTIARRHYTHMIC PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zealand Pharma A/S Smedeland 26B 2600 Glostrup / DK | [2002/39] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Zealand Pharmaceuticals A/S Smedeland 26B 2600 Glostrup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, Bjarne, Due Arildsgaard 5, 1. Th. DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | 02 /
PETERSEN, Jorgen, Soberg Springbanen 31, 2. 1 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | 03 /
MEIER, Eddi Bringebakken 18 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | 04 /
KJOLBYE, Anne, Louise Ndr. Fasanvej 269, 2. tv. DK-2200 Kobenhavn N / DK | 05 /
JORGENSEN, Niklas, Rye Seedorffsvaenge 8, 3. tv. DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | 06 /
NIELSEN, Morten, Schak Egebjergvej 51A DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | 07 /
HOLSTEIN-RATHLOU, Niels-Henrik Sonderhavevej 10B DK-2730 Herlev / DK | 08 /
MARTINS, James, B. 31 Bedford Ct. Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | 09 /
KNOTT, David Ewaldsbakken 26 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2004/23] |
Former [2003/01] | 01 /
LARSEN, Bjarne, Due Arildsgaard 5, 1. Th. DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | ||
02 /
PETERSEN, Jorgen, Soberg Springbanen 31, 2. 1 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | |||
03 /
MEIER, Eddi Bringebakken 18 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | |||
04 /
KJOLBYE, Anne, Louise Ndr. Fasanvej 269, 2. tv. DK-2200 Kobenhavn N / DK | |||
05 /
JORGENSEN, Niklas, Rye Seedorffsvaenge 8, 3. tv. DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | |||
06 /
NIELSEN, Morten, Schak Egebjergvej 51A DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | |||
07 /
HOLSTEIN-RATHLOU, Niels-Henrik Sonderhavevej 10B DK-2730 Herlev / DK | |||
08 /
MARTINS, James, B. 31 Bedford Ct. Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | |||
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
LARSEN, Bjarne, Due Arildsgaard 5, 1. Th. DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | ||
02 /
PETERSEN, Jorgen, Soberg Springbanen 31, 2. 1 DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | |||
03 /
MEIER, Eddi Bringebakken 18 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | |||
04 /
KJOLBYE, Anne, Louise Ndr. Fasanvej 269, 2. tv. DK-2200 Kobenhavn N / DK | |||
05 /
JORGENSEN, Niklas, Rye Seedorffsvaenge 8, 3. tv. DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | |||
06 /
NIELSEN, Morten, Schak Nannagade 16 DK-2200 Kobenhavn N / DK | |||
07 /
HOLSTEIN-RATHLOU, Niels-Henrik Sonderhavevej 10B DK-2730 Herlev / DK | |||
08 /
MARTINS, James, B. 31 Bedford Ct. Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/44] |
Former [2002/31] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01907393.1 | 22.02.2001 | [2002/31] | WO2001DK00127 | Priority number, date | DK20000000288 | 23.02.2000 Original published format: DK 200000288 | DK20000000738 | 04.05.2000 Original published format: DK 200000738 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0162775 | Date: | 30.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1226160 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226160 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K5/06139 (EP);
C07K5/06165 (EP);
C07K5/0806 (EP);
C07K5/0823 (EP);
C07K5/1008 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | 22.03.2002 | LT | 22.03.2002 | LV | 22.03.2002 | MK | 22.03.2002 | RO | 22.03.2002 | SI | 22.03.2002 | Title | German: | NEUE ANTIARRYTHMISCHE PEPTIDE | [2002/31] | English: | NOVEL ANTIARRHYTHMIC PEPTIDES | [2002/31] | French: | PEPTIDES ANTIARHYTHMIQUES | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 13.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2010/20] | TR | 22.02.2005 | |
Former [2010/04] | IT | 22.02.2005 | |
TR | 22.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/34] | IT | 22.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4775743 (MIMURA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,19-37,114-137 * column W *; | [X]WO9621674 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,19-37,114-137* the whole document *; | [X]DE19707854 (DHEIN STEFAN PRIV DOZ DR MED [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,19-37,114-137 * the whole document * |