Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6710117 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2004 | B2 | US2003166768 | 04.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | US20449103 | 13.01.2003 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020097186 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003524056 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4647901 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001246479C | Global Dossier | 11.08.2005 | C1 | AU2001246479B | 30.09.2004 | B2 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1263898 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2004 | B1 | EP1263898 | 11.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP01919349 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE277132T | 15.10.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0108661 | 03.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2400833 | 30.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60105775T | 23.02.2006 | T2 | DE60105775D1 | 28.10.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1263898T | 31.01.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1047763 | 18.02.2005 | B | HK1047763 | 07.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20024028L | 23.10.2002 | L | NO20024028D0 | 23.08.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL357645 | 26.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0102172 | 22.02.2001 | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0162858 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1127925 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1174056C | 03.11.2004 | C | CN1418244 | 14.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1618905 | 25.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2228839T | 16.04.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1263898E | 31.01.2005 | E | Priority number | Date | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200206510 | 14.11.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | EP00200666 | 25.02.2000 |