EP1274475 - LOW COST DISPOSABLE NEEDLELESS INJECTOR SYSTEM FOR VARIABLE AND FIXED DOSE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HNS International, Inc. 17662 Irvine Boulevard, Suite 20 Tustin, CA 92780 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states HNS International, Inc. 17662 Irvine Boulevard, Suite 20 Tustin, CA 92780 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states EQUIDYNE SYSTEMS, INC. 11770 Bernardo Plaza Court, Suite 351 San Diego, CA 92128 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARSONS, J., Stuart 23875 Longspur Court Laguna Niguel, CA / US | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01925152.9 | 03.04.2001 | [2003/03] | WO2001US40436 | Priority number, date | US20000195389P | 07.04.2000 Original published format: US 195389 P | US20000751525 | 29.12.2000 Original published format: US 751525 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0176664 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1274475 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.10.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/30 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
A61M5/30 (EP,US);
B65D75/326 (EP,US);
B65D75/327 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2073 (EP,US);
A61M5/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILLIGER, NADELLOSER EINWEGINJEKTOR FÜR VARIABLE UND FESTE DOSIERUNGEN | [2003/03] | English: | LOW COST DISPOSABLE NEEDLELESS INJECTOR SYSTEM FOR VARIABLE AND FIXED DOSE APPLICATIONS | [2003/03] | French: | SYSTEME D'INJECTEUR D'INJECTION SANS AIGUILLES JETABLE A FAIBLE COUT DESTINE A L'APPLICATION DE DOSES FIXES OU VARIABLES | [2003/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2380534 (LOCKHART MARSHALL L) [Y] 1-29,55-77,79-81 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9001961 (INJET MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-29,55-77,79-81 * abstract ** figure 14 *; | [X]WO9503844 (WESTON MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 24,29,55-77 * abstract * * page 18, paragraph 1 - page 19, paragraph 1 * * figures 9a-9b *; | [X]WO9624398 (WESTON MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 23,24,29,55-77,79-81 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5704911 (PARSONS JAMES S [US]) [Y] 1-29,55-77,79-81 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0879609 (AVANT DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS IN [US]) [X] 23,24,29,55-77,79-81 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0006227 (MEDI JECT CORP [US]) [X] 24,55-77 * the whole document *; | [XP]DE20006986U (ROESCH AG MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) [XP] 1-29,55-77,79-81 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4913699 (PARSONS JAMES S [US]); | [Y]US5549558 (MARTIN ROBIN P [US]); | [Y]US5320616 (MAGRUDER JUDY A [US], et al); | [Y]US5062833 (PERLER ROBERT F [US]); | [Y]US5733261 (OBONG EKOI EDET [US]); | [Y]US5788677 (BOTICH MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [Y]US5344395 (WHALEN MARK J [US], et al); | [X]US4015709 (MILLET MARCUS JACOB) | by applicant | US4874367 |