EP1287393 - METHOD FOR FABRICATING AN OPTICAL PLUG CONNECTOR, DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD, AND PLUG CONNECTOR FOR USE IN SUCH A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUBER & SUHNER AG Degersheimerstrasse 14 9100 Herisau / CH | [2003/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREUB, Daniel Spisergasse 13 CH-9000 St. Gallen / CH | 02 /
KOCH, Beat Böhl 569 CH-9104 Waldstatt / CH | 03 /
MARJETIC, Igor Bischofszellerstrasse 338 CH-9212 Arnegg / CH | 04 /
TANNER, Paul Sonder 621 CH-9103 Schwellbrunn / CH | 05 /
BURKHARD, Martin Saum CH-9100 Herisau / CH | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/10] | 01 /
GREUB, Daniel Magnihalden 7 CH-9000 St. Gallen / CH | ||
02 /
KOCH, Beat Böhl 569 CH-9104 Waldstatt / CH | |||
03 /
MARJETIC, Igor Bischofszellerstrasse 338 CH-9212 Arnegg / CH | |||
04 /
TANNER, Paul Sonder 621 CH-9103 Schwellbrunn / CH | |||
05 /
BURKHARD, Martin Saum CH-9100 Herisau / CH | Representative(s) | Ottow, Jens M., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Ottow, Jens M., Dr., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 01927549.4 | 11.05.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001CH00290 | Priority number, date | CH20000001106 | 05.06.2000 Original published format: CH 11062000 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0195001 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287393 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1287393 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
G02B6/3861 (EP,US);
G02B6/25 (EP,US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US);
G02B6/4471 (EP,US);
G02B6/4477 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KONFEKTIONIEREN EINES OPTISCHEN STECKVERBINDERS, VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS SOWIE STECKVERBINDER FÜR DEN EINSATZ BEI EINEM SOLCHEN VERFAHREN | [2003/10] | English: | METHOD FOR FABRICATING AN OPTICAL PLUG CONNECTOR, DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD, AND PLUG CONNECTOR FOR USE IN SUCH A METHOD | [2003/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN CONNECTEUR OPTIQUE ENFICHABLE, DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT LA MISE EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE ET CONNECTEUR ENFICHABLE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE DANS CE PROCEDE | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 25.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2027924 (CABLEWAVE SYSTEMS INC); | [DA]US4598974 (MUNN ROBERT D [US], et al); | [DA]US4679895 (HUBER JOHN H [US]); | [DA]US4877303 (CALDWELL KEVIN G [CA], et al); | [DA]EP0434212 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [DA]EP0486189 (AMP INC [US]); | [DA]US5757997 (BIRRELL BARBARA L [US], et al); | [DA]WO9904299 (HUBER+SUHNER AG [CH], et al) | Examination | US5102211 |