EP1273038 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A HEAT DISTRIBUTION COVER ON A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2003/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Monika Oberweg 39 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 02 /
POHL, Jens Sudetenstr. 5a 93170 Bernhardswald / DE | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Schweiger, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Schweiger & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Karl-Theodor-Strasse 69 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01942958.8 | 10.04.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001DE01400 | Priority number, date | DE2000117925 | 11.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10017925 | [2003/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0178142 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1273038 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/40, H05K3/34 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
H05K7/20445 (EP,US);
H05K3/34 (KR);
H05K7/205 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINER WÄRMEVERTEILUNGSABDECKUNG AUF EINER LEITERPLATTE | [2003/02] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXING A HEAT DISTRIBUTION COVER ON A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD | [2003/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A FIXER UN COUVERCLE DE REPARTITION DE CHALEUR SUR UNE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIME | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 10.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH06177320 ; | [Y]US5541811 (HENNINGSSON BO U E [SE], et al) [Y] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US4625260 (JORDAN WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06112676 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940922), vol. 018, no. 507, Database accession no. (E - 1609), & JP06177320 A 19940624 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940721), vol. 018, no. 390, Database accession no. (E - 1582), & JP06112676 A 19940422 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [A] 1,9,10 * abstract * |