Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination | |
16.06.2006 | Change - applicant | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
25.06.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] |
25.05.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.03.2004 | First examination report | |
17.03.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
08.07.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
08.07.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
23.05.2003 | Renewal fee | |
28.03.2003 | Change - inventor | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
28.12.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
28.12.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
13.12.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.11.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.04.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.11.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.11.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.11.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.08.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication |