EP1282692 - SENTINEL VIRUS II [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2003/07] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jen-Kuei 4039 Scripps Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
LEWIS, Samantha 619 Natoma Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 03 /
BOHENZKY, Roy Apt.15, 870 E. El Camino Real Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 04 /
LIN, Yu-Huei 462 Crescent Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 90087 / US | 05 /
RAMASWAMY, Latha 3333 Valley Square Lane San Jose, CA 95117 / US | 06 /
MONTIEL, Janine 37202 Yolo Terrace Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 07 /
BATZ, Hans-Georg Traubinger-Str. 63 82327 Tutzing / DE | 08 /
CHEN, Benjamin 2711 Parkside Drive Fremont, CA 94536 / US | [2003/20] |
Former [2003/07] | 01 /
LIU, Jen-Kuei 4039 Scripps Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | ||
02 /
LEWIS, Samantha 619 Natoma Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | |||
03 /
BOHENZKY, Roy Apt.15, 870 E. El Camino Real Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | |||
04 /
LIN, Yu-Huei 462 Crescent Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 90087 / US | |||
05 /
RAMASWAMY, Latha 3333 Valley Square Lane San Jose, CA 95117 / US | |||
06 /
MONTIEL, Janine 1220 Normandy Way Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | |||
07 /
BATZ, Hans-Georg Traubinger-Str. 63 82327 Tutzing / DE | |||
08 /
CHEN, Benjamin 2711 Parkside Drive Fremont, CA 94536 / US | Application number, filing date | 01943319.2 | 04.05.2001 | [2003/07] | WO2001EP05029 | Priority number, date | US20000202271P | 05.05.2000 Original published format: US 202271 P | [2003/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0185770 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1282692 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/00, C07K14/01, A61K39/12, C07K16/08, G01N33/569, C12N15/34, A61P31/20, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2710/00022 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENTINEL VIRUS II | [2003/07] | English: | SENTINEL VIRUS II | [2003/07] | French: | VIRUS SENTINELLE II | [2003/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9958638 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al); |