Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1330804 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2004 | B1 | EP1330804 | 30.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT11702000 | 07.07.2000 | AT0100227 | 09.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE265080T | 15.05.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AT11702000 | 07.07.2000 | AT0100227 | 09.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50102079D1 | 27.05.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AT11702000 | 07.07.2000 | AT0100227 | 09.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0301609 | 28.08.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | AT11702000 | 07.07.2000 | AT0100227 | 09.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0205243 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT11702000 | 07.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT411634B | 25.03.2004 | B | ATA11702000 | 15.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | AT11702000 | 07.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ20024246 | 18.06.2003 | A3 | Priority number | Date | AT11702000 | 07.07.2000 |