EP1330804 - WARNING DEVICE FOR MOTORISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens AG Österreich Siemensstrasse 88-92 1210 Wien / AT | [2003/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, Gerhard Haus 50 A-3231 St. Margareten / AT | 02 /
KOLLER, Michael DI verstorben / AT | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Matschnig, Franz Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Siebensterngasse 54 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Matschnig, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Siebensterngasse 54, Postfach 252 1071 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 01944726.7 | 09.07.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001AT00227 | Priority number, date | AT20000001170 | 07.07.2000 Original published format: AT 11702000 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205243 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1330804 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1330804 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0965 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
G08G1/0965 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/31] | Title | German: | WARNEINRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRER | [2003/31] | English: | WARNING DEVICE FOR MOTORISTS | [2003/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF AVERTISSEUR POUR CONDUCTEURS | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 15.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.04.2004 | FI | 21.04.2004 | FR | 21.04.2004 | GB | 21.04.2004 | IE | 21.04.2004 | IT | 21.04.2004 | NL | 21.04.2004 | TR | 21.04.2004 | LU | 09.07.2004 | DK | 21.07.2004 | GR | 21.07.2004 | SE | 21.07.2004 | BE | 31.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | ES | 01.08.2004 | PT | 21.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | CY | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
FR | 21.04.2004 | ||
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
IT | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
TR | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 09.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CY | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
FR | 21.04.2004 | ||
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
TR | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 09.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
FR | 21.04.2004 | ||
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
TR | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 09.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
FR | 21.04.2004 | ||
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 09.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
NL | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 09.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 09.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
LU | 09.07.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
IE | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 21.04.2004 | |
GB | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 21.04.2004 | |
SE | 21.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 21.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2613360 (SADLER WILLIAM S); | [DA]DE4005445 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5303259 (LOVEALL PETER S [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * column 3, line 37 - line 49 *; | [A]GB2330989 (DUNSTER CLIVE WILLIAM [GB]) [A] 1-13 * page 4, line 10 - line 22 *; | [DY]EP0942402 (FEDERAL SIGNAL CORP [US]) [DY] 1,2,4,6 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] , [0067] , [0096] , [0112] , [0113] * |