EP1289556 - Isoflavones against radiation-induced mortality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/11] | PHYTOESTROGENIC ISOFLAVONE COMPOSITIONS | ||
[2007/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States of America, represented by The Secretary, Dept. of Health and Human Services, the Natl Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Blvd., Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | For all designated states The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc. 1401 Rockville Pike Suite 600 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states The United States of America, represented by The Secretary, Dept. of Health and Human Services, the Natl Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Blvd., Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | ||
For all designated states The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the advancement of Military Medicine, Inc. 1401 Rockville Pike, Suite 600 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | |||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states The United States of America, represented by The Secretary, Dept. of Health and Human Services, the Natl Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Blvd., Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | ||
For all designated states Uniformed Services University of Health Sciences Department of Defense, United States Government 4301 Jones Bridge Road Bethesda Maryland 20814 / US | |||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states The United States of America, represented by The Secretary, Dept. of Health and Human Services, the Natl. Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Blvd., Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | ||
For all designated states Uniformed Services University of Health Sciences Department of Defense, United States Government 4301 Jones Bridge Road Bethesda, Maryland 20814 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDAUER, Michael, R. 6000 Melvern Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 02 /
SEED, Thomas, Michael 4417 Maple Avenue Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 03 /
SRINIVASAN, Venkataraman 19228 St. Johnsbury Lane Germantown, MD 20876 / US | 04 /
SHAPIRO, Alla 4900 Artic Terrace Rockville, MD 20853 / US | 05 /
TAKIMOTO, Chris, H. 8386 Settlers Peak Boerne, TX 78015 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01950301.0 | 12.06.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001US19089 | Priority number, date | US20000211375P | 14.06.2000 Original published format: US 211375 P | US20000223734P | 08.08.2000 Original published format: US 223734 P | [2005/33] |
Former [2004/37] | US20000211375P | 12.06.2000 | |
US20000223734P | 08.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/11] | US20000223734P | 08.08.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0195937 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1289556 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289556 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/352, A61P43/00 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K41/00 (EP,US);
A61K41/0038 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07D311/26 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/21172 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | A61K41/00, A61P43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | 12.12.2002 | LT | 12.12.2002 | LV | 12.12.2002 | MK | 12.12.2002 | RO | 12.12.2002 | SI | 12.12.2002 | Title | German: | Isoflavonen gegen strahlungsinduzierte Mortalität | [2007/02] | English: | Isoflavones against radiation-induced mortality | [2007/02] | French: | Isoflavones contre la mortalité radio-induite | [2007/02] |
Former [2003/11] | PHYTOESTROGENE ISOFLAVONE FORMULIERUNGEN | ||
Former [2003/11] | PHYTOESTROGENIC ISOFLAVONE COMPOSITIONS | ||
Former [2003/11] | COMPOSITIONS D'ISOFLAVONE PHYTO-OESTROGENIQUES, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION A DES FINS DE PROTECTION CONTRE DES LESIONS PRODUITES PAR RAYONNEMENT ET DE TRAITEMENT DE CES LESIONS | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06024432.4 / EP1767215 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2007 | BE | 06.06.2007 | CY | 06.06.2007 | DK | 06.06.2007 | FI | 06.06.2007 | TR | 06.06.2007 | LU | 12.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | SE | 06.09.2007 | GR | 07.09.2007 | PT | 06.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LU | 12.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
BE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 06.06.2007 | |
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 06.06.2007 | |
SE | 06.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5824702 (WEI HUACHEN [US]) [X] 1-40 * claim - *; | [E]WO0195901 (SHAPIRO ALLA [US]) [E] 1-40 * claims 1,4,13-15 * | [X] - EMERIT, I. ET AL, "Oxidative stress-related clastogenic factors in plasma from Chernobyl liquidators: protective effects of antioxidant plant phenols, vitamins an oligoelements", MUTAT. RES. (1997), 377(2), 239-246, XP002197075 [X] 1-40 * page 244, column 2, paragraph 2; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0027-5107(97)00080-8 | [X] - SHIMOI, KAYOKO ET AL, "Radioprotective effect of antioxidative flavonoids in.gamma.-ray irradiated mice", CARCINOGENESIS (1994), 15(11), 2669-72, XP001073576 [X] 1-40 * tables I,II * | [X] - UMA DEVI P ET AL, "In vivo radioprotection by ocimum flavonoids: surviva of mice.", RADIATION RESEARCH, (1999 JAN) 151 (1) 74-8., XP001073577 [X] 1-40 * abstract * | [PX] - LANDAUER, M. R. (1) ET AL, "Protection from lethal irradiation by genistein.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF TOXICOLOGY, (NOVEMBER DECEMBER, 2000) VOL. 19, NO. 6, PP. 37. PRINT. MEETING INFO.: 21ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF TOXICOLOGY SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA NOVEMBER 12-15, 2000, XP001073541 [PX] 1-40 * abstract * |