EP1402371 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMISSION OF DATA FOR TWO- OR THREE-DIMENSIONAL GEOMETRICAL ENTITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OKYZ 12, rue Vivienne 75002 Paris / FR | [2004/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE MASNE, Francois 25, rue Duranton F-75015 Paris / FR | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Laget, Jean-Loup Cabinet Loyer, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01951767.1 | 04.07.2001 | [2004/14] | WO2001FR02136 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03005201 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1402371 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402371 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/34 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
G06T19/00 (KR);
A63F13/00 (KR);
G06F11/3466 (EP,US);
G06T2210/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR DIE AUSFUHR VON DATENVERBÄNDEN ZU ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN ODER DREIDIMENSIONALEN GEOMETRISCHEN ENTITÄTEN | [2004/22] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMISSION OF DATA FOR TWO- OR THREE-DIMENSIONAL GEOMETRICAL ENTITIES | [2004/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'EXPORTATION DE DONNEES ASSOCIEES A DES ENTITES GEOMETRIQUES BIDIMENSIONNELLES OU TRIDIMENSIONNELLES | [2004/14] |
Former [2004/14] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR DIE AUSFUHR VON DATENVERBANDEN ZU ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN ODER DREIDIMENSIONALEN GEOMETRISCHEN ENTITÄTEN | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 23.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2005
15.05.2006
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED Dassault Systèmes 9, quai Marcel Dassault, B.P. 310 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Hirsch & Associés 29bis, rue d' Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2005
15.05.2006
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED Dassault Systèmes 9, quai Marcel Dassault, B.P. 310 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2005
15.05.2006
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED Dassault Systèmes 9, quai Marcel Dassault, B.P. 310 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2005
15.05.2006
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED Dassault Systèmes 9, quai Marcel Dassault, B.P. 310 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2005
Dassault Systèmes 9, quai Marcel Dassault, B.P. 310 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Desrousseaux, Grégoire Marie Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | 15.07.2005 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Opposition is deemed not to be filed 01 | 28.05.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular right | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 06.10.2004 | AT | 04.07.2005 | CY | 04.07.2005 | IE | 04.07.2005 | LU | 04.07.2005 | PT | 04.07.2005 | ES | 05.07.2005 | SE | 05.07.2005 | FI | 10.07.2005 | BE | 31.07.2005 | CH | 31.07.2005 | LI | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | DK | 01.08.2005 | NL | 01.02.2006 | GR | 02.02.2006 | GB | 04.07.2014 | IT | 04.07.2014 | FR | 31.07.2014 | DE | 03.02.2015 | [2015/24] |
Former [2015/23] | TR | 06.10.2004 | |
AT | 04.07.2005 | ||
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 04.07.2005 | ||
ES | 05.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
IT | 04.07.2014 | ||
DE | 03.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | TR | 06.10.2004 | |
AT | 04.07.2005 | ||
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 04.07.2005 | ||
ES | 05.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
DE | 03.02.2015 | ||
Former [2009/42] | TR | 06.10.2004 | |
AT | 04.07.2005 | ||
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 04.07.2005 | ||
ES | 05.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 04.07.2005 | |
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 04.07.2005 | ||
ES | 05.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 04.07.2005 | |
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 04.07.2005 | ||
ES | 05.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 04.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 04.07.2005 | |
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
ES | 05.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 04.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 04.07.2005 | |
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 04.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | CY | 04.07.2005 | |
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 04.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CY | 04.07.2005 | |
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | CY | 04.07.2005 | |
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | IE | 04.07.2005 | |
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.08.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | IE | 04.07.2005 | |
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/28] | IE | 04.07.2005 | |
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | IE | 04.07.2005 | |
SE | 05.07.2005 | ||
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | IE | 04.07.2005 | |
FI | 10.07.2005 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 10.07.2005 | |
NL | 01.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0822499 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); |