EP1257170 - METHOD FOR ANONYMOUSLY REGISTERING, STORING AND USING BODY MATERIAL AND/OR INFORMATION DERIVED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intresco B.V. Spechtenkamp 99 3607 KE Maarssen / NL | [2005/51] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Nietfeld, Jan Jaap Spechtenkamp 99 3607 KE Maarssen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nietfeld, Jan Jaap Spechtenkamp 99 3607 KE Maarssen / NL | [2005/51] |
Former [2002/47] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/47] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01952044.4 | 26.02.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001NL00160 | Priority number, date | NL20001014491 | 25.02.2000 Original published format: NL 1014491 | [2002/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0170023 | Date: | 27.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257170 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257170 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, A61B5/117 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A61B5/117 (EP,US);
G16H10/20 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANONYMEN REGISTRIEREN, SPEICHERN UND VERWENDEN VON KÖRPERMATERIAL UND/ODER DAVON ABGELEITETER INFORMATION | [2002/47] | English: | METHOD FOR ANONYMOUSLY REGISTERING, STORING AND USING BODY MATERIAL AND/OR INFORMATION DERIVED THEREFROM | [2002/47] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT, DE MEMORISATION ET D'UTILISATION ANONYME DE MATERIAU ANATOMIQUE ET/OU D'INFORMATION DERIVEE DE CE MATERIAU | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2001 | Translation filed | 23.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 20.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | LU | 18.03.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | TR | 18.01.2006 | |
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 18.01.2006 | |
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
LU | 18.03.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | MC | 28.02.2006 | |
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | MC | 28.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9109521 (CRYO CELL INT [US]) [A] 1,2* claims 12,15,16 *; | [A]WO9515493 (ANONYMOUS TEST SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,8 * claim - *; | [X]WO9743453 (BEECHAM JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-8 * claim - * * page 8, line 20 - line 26 * |