EP1311687 - PUTATIVE HUMAN METHYLTRANSFERASE FAMILY MEMBER AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | ||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Meyers, Rachel, E 115 Devonshire Road Newton, MA 02468 / US | ||
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYERS, Rachel 115 Devonshire Road Newton, MA 02468 / US | 02 /
TSAI, Fong-Ying 15 Montclair Road Newton, MA 02168 / US | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Hall, Robert Leonard, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Hall, Robert Leonard, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct, Leopold Street Sheffield S1 2QD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01952772.0 | 16.07.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001US22321 | Priority number, date | US20000218470P | 14.07.2000 Original published format: US 218470 P | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0208395 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1311687 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
C12N9/1007 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÖGLICHES, MENSCHLICHES MITGLIED DER METHYLTRANSFERASENFAMILIE UND DESEN VERWENDUNG | [2003/21] | English: | PUTATIVE HUMAN METHYLTRANSFERASE FAMILY MEMBER AND USES THEREOF | [2003/21] | French: | 42755, UNE NOUVEAU MEMBRE DE LA FAMILLE DE LA METHYL-TRANSFERASE HUMAINE ET SES APPLICATIONS | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0132888 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X] - OKANO M. ET AL, "CLONING AND CHARACTERISATION OF FAMILY OF NOVEL MAMMALIAN DNA (CYTOSINE-5) METHYLTRANSFERASES", NATURE GENETICS, (199807), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 219 - 220, XP002189469 [X] 1-30 * page 219, column 1 * * page 220, column 1 - column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/890 | [XY] - REICHWALD K. ET AL, "HOMO SAPIENS CHROMOSOME 8 CLONE PR11-11C20 MAP 8q11-q12", EMBL, EBI, (20000221), XP002189470 [X] 1,2,4-12,20-22 * the whole document * * see above * [Y] 13-19,23-30 | [XY] - STRAUSBER R. ET AL, "HOMO SAPIENS cDNA CLONE", EMBL, EBI, (20000707), XP002189471 [X] 1,2,4-12,20-22 * the whole document * * see above * [Y] 13-19,23-30 | [XY] - STRAUSBER R. ET AL, "HOMO SAPIENSE cDNA CLONE", EMBL, EBI, (19990317), XP002189472 [X] 1,2,4-12,20-22 * the whole document * * see above * [Y] 13-19,23-30 | [Y] - MUDGETT M.B. ET AL, "CHARACTERISATION OF PLANT L-ISOASPARTYL METHYLTRASFERASES THAT MY BE INVOLVED IN SEED SURVIVAL", EMBL, EBI, (19971101), XP002189473 [Y] 13-19,23-30 * the whole document * | [Y] - MUDGETTA M.B. ET AL, "A DISTINCTLY REGULATED PROTEIN REPARE L-ISOASPARTYLMETHYLTRANSFERASE FROM ARABIDOBSIS THALIANA", EMBL, EBI, (19971101), XP002189474 [Y] 13-19,23-30 * the whole document * | [Y] - KAGAN R.M. ET AL, "PROTEIN L-ISOASPARTYL METHYLTRANSFERASE FROM THE NEMATODE CAENORHABDITIS ELEGAS", EMBL, EBI, (19971101), XP002189475 [Y] 13-19,23-30 * the whole document * | [Y] - SMITH D.R ET AL, "COMPLETE GENEOM SEQUENCE OF METHANOBACTERIUM THERMOAUTOTROPHICUM DELTA H", EMBL, EBI, (20000530), XP002189476 [Y] 13-19,23-30 * the whole document * | [PX] - STRAUSBERGER R., "HOMO SAPIENS, SIMILAR TO HYPOTHETICAL PROTEIN FLJ10883, CLONE", EMBL, EBI, (20010713), XP002189477 [PX] 1,2,4-12,20-22 * the whole document * | [PX] - BIRREN B. ET AL, "HOMO SAPIENS CHROMOSOME 8 CLONE RP11-11C20 MAP 8", EMBL, EBI, (20010219), XP002189478 [PX] 1,2,4-12,20-22 * the whole document * |