Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03013050 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE0102926 | 01.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004218521 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE0102926 | 01.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004537239 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | DE0102926 | 01.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1413082 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE0102926 | 01.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1310460C | 11.04.2007 | C | CN1620777 | 25.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | DE0102926 | 01.08.2001 |