EP1413082 - METHOD FOR DATA COMMUNICATION BETWEEN A SINGLE-CARRIER AND A MULTI-CARRIER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLINTH, Edgar Rheindahlener Str. 88 41189 Mönchengladbach / DE | 02 /
KERN, Ralf Holtwicker Strasse 62A 46399 Bocholt / DE | [2004/18] | Application number, filing date | 01957743.6 | 01.08.2001 | [2004/18] | WO2001DE02926 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03013050 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1413082 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/02, H04L27/26 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
H04L5/023 (EP,US);
H04L27/02 (EP,US);
H04L27/2017 (EP,US);
H04L27/2601 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DATENKOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN EINEM EINZEL- UND EINEM MEHR-TRÄGER-SYSTEM | [2004/18] | English: | METHOD FOR DATA COMMUNICATION BETWEEN A SINGLE-CARRIER AND A MULTI-CARRIER SYSTEM | [2004/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES ENTRE UN SYSTEME A UNE PORTEUSE ET UN SYSTEME A PLUSIEURS PORTEUSES | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/52] | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0938193 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 3* paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US5963592 (KIM YOUNG-SANG [KR]) [A] 3,4,6-9 * column 1, line 28 - line 57 *; | [A]US6021158 (SCHURR PAUL E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 18, line 10 - line 16 * * column 25, line 47 - line 57 *; | [A]EP0986196 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * claims 1,2 * |