Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1424919
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
08.07.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
18.03.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.11.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
12.11.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
01.11.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.10.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.08.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.07.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.07.2004 |
First examination report |
|
29.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.04.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
23.04.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
13.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|