EP1424919 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REMOVING PARASITES FROM A HAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FACO S.A. Avenue de l'Indépendance 25 B-4020 Wandre / BE | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMAL, Henri 41/4, rempart des Arquebusiers B-4600 Vise / BE | 02 /
JULEMONT, Pierre 88, chaussée d'Argenteau B-4601 Argenteau / BE | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 01969085.8 | 12.09.2001 | [2004/24] | WO2001BE00153 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03022095 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424919 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A45D24/00, A45D24/30 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
A45D24/04 (EP);
A45D24/30 (EP);
A61B2017/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERNICHTEN VON LÄUSE | [2004/24] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REMOVING PARASITES FROM A HAIR | [2004/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR L'ELIMINATION DE PARASITES D'UNE CHEVELURE | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 02.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/34] | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0371501 (MEPRO EPILADY LTD) [X] 1 * column 4, lines 32-57 * * column 11, lines 28-54; figures 9A,9B,9C * [A] 2-11; | [A]US5915391 (REVIL CLAUDE) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5918607 (ZUCKER SHLOMO) [DA] 1-11 * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3474795 (LUTZ EUGENE F ET AL) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3850181 (BAKER F) [A] 1-11 * column 1, lines 5-15 * * column 2, lines 23-59; figures 1-3 * |