Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004516531 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2375700 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01971369 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9126301 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1312023 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2006 | A4 | EP1312023 | 21.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0107126 | 11.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2388079 | 28.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10193513 | 17.11.2011 | B3 | DE10193513T | 13.03.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI20020760 | 19.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL149249 | 24.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO322907B | 18.12.2006 | B1 | NO20021849L | 19.04.2002 | L | NO20021849D0 | 19.04.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE0201170L | 20.06.2002 | L | SE0201170D0 | 18.04.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US0141785 | 17.08.2001 | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0217204 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100503677B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2005 | B1 | KR20020042879 | 07.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH693730 | 31.12.2003 | A5 | Priority number | Date | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1201256C | 11.05.2005 | C | CN1388935 | 01.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2255338 | 16.07.2007 | B1 | ES2255338 | 16.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2251729 | 10.05.2005 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR200201098T | 23.08.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7020602 | 28.03.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US64247100 | 21.08.2000 | Type | Divisional application | EP2375700 |