EP1312023 - NATIVE LANGUAGE DOMAIN NAME REGISTRATION AND USAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Ki Seok 15101 Graventein Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878-4700 / US | For all designated states Yoo, Jiyul 9437 Van Arsdale Drive Vienna, VI 22181-6117 / US | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Exell, Jonathan Mark Elkington & Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Exell, Jonathan Mark Elkington & Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01971369.2 | 17.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001US41785 | Priority number, date | US20000642471 | 21.08.2000 Original published format: US 642471 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0217204 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312023 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, // H04L29/12 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
H04L61/301 (EP,SE,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,ES,FI,SE,US);
G06F40/129 (FI);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F16/00 (ES);
H04L61/45 (EP,SE,US);
G06F16/9566 (FI);
G06F40/53 (FI);
G06Q50/60 (FI);
H04L61/30 (EP,SE,US);
H04L61/3015 (EP,SE,US);
H04L2101/32 (EP,SE,US);
H04L2101/604 (EP,SE,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/21] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOMAIN-NAMENREGISTRATION UND BENUTZUNG IN NATIVER SPRACHE | [2003/21] | English: | NATIVE LANGUAGE DOMAIN NAME REGISTRATION AND USAGE | [2003/21] | French: | ENREGISTREMENT DE NOM DE DOMAINE EN LANGUE AUTOCHTONE ET UTILISATION | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 06.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2010 | 14.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/12] | 13.11.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/12] | Divisional application(s) | EP10184360.5 / EP2375700 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5900871 (ATKIN STEVEN EDWARD [US], et al); | [Y]US5974453 (ANDERSEN DAVID B [US], et al) |