21.10.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
08.06.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.03.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.10.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.10.2010 |
First examination report |
|
16.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
15.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2007 |
Change - English title |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
14.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
19.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] |
23.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] |
24.01.2004 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
24.01.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] |
15.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2004 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
15.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|