Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0192230 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6673935 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2004 | B2 | US2003153600 | 14.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US86577101 | 25.05.2001 | US34238003 | 14.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100757699B | Global Dossier | 13.09.2007 | B1 | KR20030003762 | 10.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4142621B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2008 | B2 | JP2005047927 | 24.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004530706 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0129551 | 21.09.2001 | US86577101 | 25.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3665053B | Global Dossier | 29.06.2005 | B2 | JP2004501116 | 15.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1296951 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2010 | B1 | EP1296951 | 02.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6480401 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001292907B | Global Dossier | 26.07.2007 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US0129551 | 21.09.2001 | US86577101 | 25.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001264804B | Global Dossier | 06.04.2006 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1395562 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2006 | A4 | EP1395562 | 10.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0129551 | 21.09.2001 | US86577101 | 25.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR028577 | 14.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE483687T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG65855B | 31.03.2010 | B1 | BG107237 | 30.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0111140 | 25.05.2021 | B8 | BRPI0111140 | 13.03.2018 | B1 | BR0111140 | 11.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2410234 | 13.05.2008 | C | CA2410234 | 06.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2447878 | 01.02.2011 | C | CA2447878 | 05.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0129551 | 21.09.2001 | US86577101 | 25.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1227233C | 16.11.2005 | C | CN1443168 | 17.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR6606 | 06.02.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1111440T | 05.08.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | EP01939267 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ20023888 | 12.02.2003 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60143197D1 | 18.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1296951T | 24.01.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA004809 | 26.08.2004 | B1 | EA200201264 | 24.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EE05242 | 15.12.2009 | B1 | EE200200655 | 16.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG24189 | 08.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2351958T | 14.02.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GC0000362 | 31.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GEP20053492 | 25.04.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GT200100091 | 28.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1058932 | 11.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HN2001000110 | 06.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20020934 | 31.01.2012 | B1 | HRP20020934 | 28.02.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU228423 | 28.03.2013 | B1 | HUP0302336 | 28.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN2089CHE2002 | 25.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN5103CHE2007 | 27.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS2806B | 15.09.2012 | B | IS6630 | 20.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JO2216B1 | 07.10.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA26919 | 20.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ME00428 | 10.10.2011 | B | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX230696 | 19.09.2005 | B | MXPA02011619 | 27.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY123569 | 31.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO324495B | 29.10.2007 | B1 | NO20025674L | 26.11.2002 | L | NO20025674D0 | 26.11.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ522394 | 28.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PA8516901 | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20011324 | 28.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12001001175 | 10.08.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL358153 | 09.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1296951E | 07.12.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS51541 | 30.06.2011 | B | YU89402 | 28.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1296951T | 31.01.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | EP01939267 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK287174B | 08.02.2010 | B6 | SK16702002 | 02.05.2003 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SV2002000462 | 08.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI303634B | 01.12.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA73355 | 15.07.2005 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US0116566 | 22.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6521642 | 18.02.2003 | B2 | US2002016343 | 07.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US86577101 | 25.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6800647 | 05.10.2004 | B2 | US2002147221 | 10.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | US95796601 | 21.09.2001 | US86577101 | 25.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200209558 | 28.10.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US20801700 | 26.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02096877 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86577101 | 25.05.2001 |