EP1395562 - 5-CHLORO-3-(4-METHANESULFONYLPHENYL)-6'-METHYL- 2,3' BIPYRIDINYL IN PURE CRYSTALLINE FORM AND PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/11] | 5-CHLORO-3-(4-METHANESULFONYLPHENYL)-6'-METHYL- 2,3']BIPYRIDINYL IN PURE CRYSTALLINE FORM AND PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIS | ||
[2007/45] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2010/10] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROCKER, Louis, S. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
DAVIES, Ian, W. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
OSIFCHIN, Richard, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
KOTLIAR, Andrew 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2004/11] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc., European Patent Department, Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01973314.6 | 21.09.2001 | [2004/11] | WO2001US29551 | Priority number, date | US20010865771 | 25.05.2001 Original published format: US 865771 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02096877 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395562 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/62, A61K31/44 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | 29.12.2003 | LT | 29.12.2003 | LV | 29.12.2003 | MK | 29.12.2003 | RO | 29.12.2003 | SI | 29.12.2003 | Title | German: | 5-CHLOR-3-(4-METHANSULFONYL PHENYL)-6--METHYLç2,3-]BIPYRIDINYL IN REINER KRISTALLINER FORM UND SYNTHESEVERFAHREN | [2007/45] | English: | 5-CHLORO-3-(4-METHANESULFONYLPHENYL)-6'-METHYL- 2,3' BIPYRIDINYL IN PURE CRYSTALLINE FORM AND PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIS | [2007/45] | French: | 5-CHLORO-3-(4-METHANESULFONYLPHENYLE)-6'-METHYLE- 2,3' BIPYRIDINYLE SOUS FORME CRISTALLINE PURE ET PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE | [2007/45] |
Former [2004/11] | 5-CHLOR-3-(4-METHANSULFONYL PHENYL)-6--METHYLç2,3-!BIPYRIDINYL IN REINER KRISTALLINER FORM UND SYNTHESEVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2004/11] | 5-CHLORO-3-(4-METHANESULFONYLPHENYL)-6'-METHYL- 2,3']BIPYRIDINYL IN PURE CRYSTALLINE FORM AND PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIS | ||
Former [2004/11] | 5-CHLORO-3-(4-METHANESULFONYLPHENYLE)-6'-METHYLE- 2,3']BIPYRIDINYLE SOUS FORME CRISTALLINE PURE ET PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 26.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 16.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5861419 (DUBE DANIEL [CA], et al) [AD] 1,8,9 * column 10, lines 21 -55; example 23 *; | [PA]WO0137833 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [PA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [L]WO0192230 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [L] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A] - M. BAUER, S.T.P. PHARMA PRATIQUE, (1999), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 354 - 362, XP001167029 [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [X] - DAVIES J.M., "A practical synthesis of a COX-2-specific inhibitor", (2000), vol. 65, no. 25, pages 8415 - 8420, XP002906140 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo000870z |