|
02.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2003 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.10.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
30.04.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
22 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |