Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004517055 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0130212 | 21.09.2001 | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002214543B | Global Dossier | 17.11.2005 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US0130212 | 21.09.2001 | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1454302 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0130212 | 21.09.2001 | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1330246 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2005 | B1 | EP1330246 | 30.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0130212 | 21.09.2001 | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE293969T | 15.05.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0130212 | 21.09.2001 | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2419373 | 02.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0130212 | 21.09.2001 | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60110449T | 01.12.2005 | T2 | DE60110449D1 | 02.06.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0130212 | 21.09.2001 | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1330246T | 08.08.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0130212 | 21.09.2001 | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6462082 | 08.10.2002 | B2 | US2002103257 | 01.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96534801 | 27.09.2001 | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0234258 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2237607T | 01.08.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1330246E | 30.06.2005 | E | Priority number | Date | US24250100 | 23.10.2000 |