EP1330246 - USE OF HYDROXYEICOSATETRAENOIC ACID DERIVATIVES IN INTRAOCULAR SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69 P.O. BOX 62 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Alcon Inc. Bösch 69, P.O. BOX 62 6331 Hünenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARAKELLE, Mutlu 6713 Glen Meadow Drive Fort Worth, TX 76132 / US | 02 /
CHAN, Kwan 4245 Arbor Gate Street Fort Worth, TX 76133 / US | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Teipel, Stephan, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01983088.4 | 27.09.2001 | [2003/31] | WO2001US30212 | Priority number, date | US20000242501P | 23.10.2000 Original published format: US 242501 P | [2003/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0234258 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1330246 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1330246 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/202, A61P41/00, A61L31/04, C07C51/00 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
A61L31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K31/232 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/31] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HYDROXYEICOSATETRAENSÄURE FÜR INTRAOKULÄRE CHIRURGIE | [2003/31] | English: | USE OF HYDROXYEICOSATETRAENOIC ACID DERIVATIVES IN INTRAOCULAR SURGERY | [2003/31] | French: | UTILISATION DE DERIVES D'ACIDE HYDROXYEICOSATETRANOIQUE (HETE) DANS LA CHIRURGIE INTRA-OCULAIRE | [2003/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 27.04.2005 | [2009/42] | Cited in | International search | [X]US4906467 (SCHWARTZMAN MICHAL L [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US5103840 (KAVOUSSI HAROLD P [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5409904 (HECHT GERALD [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XD]US5696166 (YANNI JOHN M [US], et al) [XD] 8,9 * column 5, lines 11-35 *; | [A]DE19853007 (MEYER MATTHIAS [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0134554 (ALCON UNIVERSAL LTD [CH], et al) [PX] 8,9* page 14, line 11 - page 15, line 15 * |