|
19.12.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
217 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
219 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
26 |
|
01.02.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
191 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |