Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004235830 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0113062 | 12.11.2001 | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20030077542 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0113062 | 12.11.2001 | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004522716 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0113062 | 12.11.2001 | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2483902 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0113062 | 12.11.2001 | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1339670 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0113062 | 12.11.2001 | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0115611 | 06.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0113062 | 12.11.2001 | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2429328 | 30.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0113062 | 12.11.2001 | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA03004537 | 26.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0113062 | 12.11.2001 | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL362566 | 02.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0113062 | 12.11.2001 | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0242257 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10058461 | 19.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10058461 | 24.11.2000 |