30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
04.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
30.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
23.07.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
30.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
19.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
05.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
22.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
14.08.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
10.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.03.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.02.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.12.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2006 |
First examination report |
|
29.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.02.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] |
11.02.2005 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] |
24.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
05.02.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
20.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
22.08.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|