Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004515479 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 | NZ0100267 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002216481B | Global Dossier | 01.05.2008 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 | NZ0100267 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1648102 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 | NZ0100267 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1349568 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2009 | B1 | EP1349568 | 30.03.2005 | A4 | EP1349568 | 08.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 | NZ0100267 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE442856T | 15.10.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 | NZ0100267 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2436856 | 13.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 | NZ0100267 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60139954D1 | 29.10.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 | NZ0100267 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003124142 | 03.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 | US679701 | 04.12.2001 | NZ0100267 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0245739 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ544579 | 21.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US25124300 | 04.12.2000 |