EP1349568 - IMMUNOMODULATORY CONSTRUCTS AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUCKLAND UNISERVICES LIMITED 58 Symonds Street Auckland / NZ | [2009/38] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Auckland Uniservices Limited 58 Symonds Street Auckland / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRASER, John David 2/191 St Johns Rd Meadowbank Auckland / NZ | 02 /
NICHOLSON, Melissa, Joy 16 First Avenue Kingsland, Auckland / NZ | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01999384.9 | 04.12.2001 | [2003/41] | WO2001NZ00267 | Priority number, date | US20000251243P | 04.12.2000 Original published format: US 251243 P | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0245739 | Date: | 13.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349568 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349568 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.06.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/38, G01N33/53 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
A61K39/385 (EP,US);
A61K39/092 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K14/31 (EP,US);
C07K14/315 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5154 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6068 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/41] | A61K39/00, A61K39/39, C07K19/00, C07K14/00, C07K14/315, C12N15/31, A61P37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNMODULATORISCHE KONSTRUKTIONEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2003/41] | English: | IMMUNOMODULATORY CONSTRUCTS AND THEIR USES | [2003/41] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS IMMUNOMODULATRICES ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIEES | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 02.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.2009 | BE | 16.09.2009 | CY | 16.09.2009 | DK | 16.09.2009 | FI | 16.09.2009 | IT | 16.09.2009 | NL | 16.09.2009 | SE | 16.09.2009 | TR | 16.09.2009 | LU | 04.12.2009 | GR | 17.12.2009 | ES | 27.12.2009 | PT | 18.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LU | 04.12.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SE | 16.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9824910 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al); | [X]WO9826747 (TERMAN DAVID S [US]); | [A]US5968514 (JOHNSON HOWARD M [US], et al); | by applicant | WO9826747 |