EP1208967 - Windshield repair apparatus including crack repair fixture and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TCG (Jersey) Ltd. 4710 Kingsway, 28th Floor Barnaby, B.C. V5H 4M2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states TCGI (Jersey) Ltd. 4710 Kingsway, 28th Floor Barnaby, B.C. V5H 4M2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Jonathan P. P.O. Box 55 Maple Lake, Minnesota 55358 / US | 02 /
Syfko, Paul E. 745 Meadowood Dr. Woodbury, Minnesota 55125 / US | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02002589.6 | 16.09.1997 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | US19960720700 | 02.10.1996 Original published format: US 720700 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208967 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, B29C73/02 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
B32B17/10963 (EP,KR,US);
B25B11/00 (KR);
B29C73/025 (EP,KR,US);
C03C27/10 (KR);
B29L2031/3052 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/08] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Reparaturvorrichtung mit einer Anordnung zur Herstellung von Vorrissen | [2002/22] | English: | Windshield repair apparatus including crack repair fixture and method | [2002/22] | French: | Appareil pour la réparation d un pare-brise comprenant un dispositif et un procédé de réparation des fissures | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 18.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97939929.2 / EP0951387 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4291866 (PETERSEN PAUL S); | [A]EP0296671 (SCHOLLEN HENDRIKUS ANDREAS PET); | [A]WO9628300 (TCG INT INC [CA]) [A] 1-3,7-9 * page 9, line 25 - page 15, line 18; figures 5,6 * |