EP1234938 - Espagnolette lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Request for re-establishment of rights | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Fuhr GmbH & Co. Oststrasse 12 D-42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2002/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tönges, Reiner Herzogstrasse 57 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Grundmann, Dirk, Dr., et al Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 02002680.3 | 06.02.2002 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | DE20011007744 | 16.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10107744 | [2002/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1234938 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/02, E05C9/18 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
E05C9/021 (EP);
E05C9/002 (EP);
E05C9/026 (EP);
E05C9/1875 (EP);
E05B59/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Treibstangenverschluss | [2002/35] | English: | Espagnolette lock | [2002/35] | French: | Crémone-serrure | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/10] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 24.03.2005 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |