11.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
11.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
01.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
26.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
10.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
29.06.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] |
08.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
01.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
27.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
06.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
16.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
02.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] |
21.07.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] |
14.07.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.07.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.02.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.09.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
27.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2003 |
First examination report |
|
12.11.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.10.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
01.10.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
06.06.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] |
13.09.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
13.09.2002 |
Change - French title |
published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
05.07.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
05.07.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |