11.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
27.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
11.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
09.11.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
12.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
10.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
01.12.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
28.11.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.11.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.08.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.07.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
17.09.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
23.05.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] |
30.08.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
30.08.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |