Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1249897 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2007 | B1 | EP1249897 | 16.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11952102 | 09.04.2002 | DE10117738 | 09.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE350784T | 15.01.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US11952102 | 09.04.2002 | DE10117738 | 09.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10117738 | 17.10.2002 | C1 | Priority number | Date | US11952102 | 09.04.2002 | DE10117738 | 09.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50209121D1 | 15.02.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US11952102 | 09.04.2002 | DE50209121 | 04.04.2002 | DE10117738 | 09.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2278829T | 16.08.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US11952102 | 09.04.2002 | DE10117738 | 09.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6942520 | 13.09.2005 | B2 | US2003190834 | 09.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11952102 | 09.04.2002 | DE10117738 | 09.04.2001 |