Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1258920 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2008 | B1 | EP1258920 | 23.03.2005 | A3 | EP1258920 | 20.11.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10124038 | 16.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10124038 | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10124038 | 16.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50211941D1 | 08.05.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10124038 | 16.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6720238 | 13.04.2004 | B2 | US2002173118 | 21.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10124038 | 16.05.2001 |