EP1258920 - Method of manufacturing buried regions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATMEL Germany GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietrich, Harry Fuchsring 27 74912 Kirchardt / DE | 02 /
Dudek, Volker, Dr. Kelterstrasse 51/1 74336 Brackenheim / DE | 03 /
Schüppen, Andreas, Dr. Ginsterweg 7 74348 Lauffen / DE | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Müller, Wolf-Christian Koch Müller Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Maassstrasse 32/1 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [2009/26] |
Former [2007/09] | Müller, Wolf-Christian Patentanwalt Pilgramsroth 21E 96450 Coburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/39] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/47] | Kolb, Georg DaimlerChrysler AG, Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010016.0 | 04.05.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | DE2001124038 | 16.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10124038 | [2002/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1258920 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1258920 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1258920 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/762, H01L21/74, H01L21/20 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
H01L21/76264 (EP,US);
H01L21/74 (EP,US);
H01L21/76275 (EP,US);
H01L21/76283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/50] |
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung vergrabener Bereiche | [2002/47] | English: | Method of manufacturing buried regions | [2002/47] | French: | Procédé de formation de régions enterrées | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 24.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Request for further processing for: | 24.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 24.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000183157 ; | [A]EP0494598 (UNITRODE CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * figures 4A-4C *; | [X]US5444014 (RYUM BYUNG-RYUL [KR], et al) [X] 1,4 * figures 3A-3F *; | [X]US5496764 (SUN SHIH-WEI [US]) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0936663 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figures 3A-3F *; | [PX]US6242320 (SO SANG MUN [KR]) [PX] 1,4* figures 2A-2I *; | [X] - "SILICON-ON-INSULATOR VERTICAL COMPLEMENTARY BIPOLAR DEVICE STRUCTURE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19910901), vol. 34, no. 4A, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 166 - 170, XP000210871 [X] 1,4 * figures 2A-2E * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000183157 A 20000630 (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS IND CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * abstract * |