EP1288187 - Process for the production of carboxylic acid benzyl esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Chemicals AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooms, Pieter, Dr. Doerperhofstrasse 16 47800 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Schenke, Bernd-Ulrich Eupenstrasse 11 46236 Bottrop / DE | 03 /
Stürmann, Martin, Dr. Walter-Flex-Strasse 20 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2003/10] | Application number, filing date | 02018144.2 | 14.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE2001141830 | 27.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10141830 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1288187 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1288187 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/24, C07C69/007 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
C07C67/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/24, C07C69/007 (EP,US);
C07C67/24, C07C69/157 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Carbonsäurebenzylestern | [2003/10] | English: | Process for the production of carboxylic acid benzyl esters | [2003/10] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'esters benzyliques d'acides carboxyliques | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2197798 (GANS JR HENRY B, et al) [X] 1-3 * page 1, column L, lines 1-45 * * claim 1 * * page 3, column L, lines 11-27 *; | [XY]US2629735 (COTTLE DELMER L, et al) [X] 1-3 * claims 1-3 * * column 3, lines 36-56 * * column 4, lines 9,10,18-26 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]EP0235998 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1 * claim 1 * * page 1, lines 1-9 *; | [Y]DD286576 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * example 3 *; | [YD]DD286577 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * claim 1 ** examples 1-3 *; | [Y]DE19857314 (SEC DEP OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOL [IN]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * page 2, column 1-, lines 1-7,45-51 * * page 3, lines 49-52 *; | [XP]WO0172682 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5,10,12 * claim 1 * * page 2, lines 1-6,15-23 * * page 3, lines 18-27 *; | [XP]WO0190044 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5,10,12 * claim 1 * * page 2, lines 1-6,15-23 * * page 3, lines 18-24 *; | [XP]WO0220455 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5,10,12 * claim 1 * * page 2, lines 1-6,15-23 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 2 *; | [X] - CROSSFIRE BEILSTEIN, Beilstein Institut zur Förderung der Chemischen Wissenschaften, Frankfurt am Main, DE, Database accession no. 7160215(reaction ID), URL: XFIRE, XP002261755 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [Y] - CLARK G S, "Benzyl Acetate", PERFUMER AND FLAVORIST, WHEATON, IL, US, (198909), vol. 14, page 1-6, XP002956776 [Y] 1-15 * page 4, column L * | [ ] - JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM.;, (1897), vol. 298, page 255 |