EP1353205 - Fiber assembly alignment using fiducials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306-2024 / US | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. (a Delaware Corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306-2024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trott, Gary R. 1215 Parrott Drive San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2003/42] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021994.5 | 30.09.2002 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | US20020077464 | 14.02.2002 Original published format: US 77464 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1353205 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1353205 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1353205 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/30, G02B6/42 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G02B6/4224 (EP,US);
G02B6/3546 (EP,US);
G02B6/3556 (EP,US);
G02B6/3582 (EP,US);
G02B6/3636 (EP,US);
G02B6/3652 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/42] | G02B6/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/09] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ausrichtung einer Faseranordnung mit Hilfe von Justagemarkierungen | [2003/42] | English: | Fiber assembly alignment using fiducials | [2003/42] | French: | Alignement d'un assemblage de fibres utilisant des repères d'ajustage | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0571924 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * figure 6 *; | [A]US5613024 (SHAHID MUHAMMED A [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract ** figure 3 *; | [XA] - COHEN M S ET AL, "PASSIVE LASER-FIBER ALIGNMENT BY INDEX METHOD", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19911201), vol. 3, no. 11, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 985 - 987, XP000232697 [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * page 985, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 986, column 2, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 * [A] 3,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.97835 |