EP1327562 - Device for the storage and deposition of articles for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bihaule, Bernd Furtholz 25 71134 Aidlingen / DE | 02 /
Lindemann, Peter Amselweg 7/3 71120 Grafenau / DE | [2003/29] | Application number, filing date | 02025469.4 | 15.11.2002 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | DE2002100631 | 10.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10200631 | [2003/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1327562 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1327562 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1327562 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/04, B60N3/00 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
B60R7/04 (EP);
B60N3/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [2004/41] |
Former [2003/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufbewahrung und Ablage von Gegenständen für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2003/29] | English: | Device for the storage and deposition of articles for a motor vehicle | [2003/29] | French: | Dispositif pour ranger et déposer des articles pour un véhicule à moteur | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 19.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0911786 ; | [A]EP0190716 (IVECO MAGIRUS [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE4237855 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE29603294U (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19822700 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09011786 A 19970114 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * |