Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.02.2013 | Change - priority | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
23.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
02.03.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.01.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.09.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
15.12.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.05.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
25.05.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
20.04.2004 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
07.02.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.02.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.02.2004 | First examination report | |
30.01.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
05.12.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
09.05.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
08.05.2003 | Change - extension states |