EP1321108 - Dental apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Change - priority | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosenstatter, Otto Matzing 16 5164 Seeham / AT | [2003/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Hofinger, Stephan, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Hofinger, Stephan, et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 02028411.3 | 18.12.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | AT20010000963U | 20.12.2001 Original published format: AT 96301 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2003/26] | AT20010096320U | 20.12.2001 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1321108 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/18, A61B1/247 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
A61B1/247 (EP,US);
A61C1/18 (EP,US);
A61B1/042 (EP,US);
A61B1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/26] | Title | German: | Zahnärztliches Arbeitsgerät | [2003/26] | English: | Dental apparatus | [2003/26] | French: | Appareil dentaire | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/30] | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0045943 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * page 2, lines 24-30 * * page 3, lines 1-13 * * figure - *; | [XY]DE4211233 (KALTENBACH & VOIGT [DE]) [X] 1 * column 14, lines 16-47 * * figure 13 * [Y] 6-10; | [Y]DE19733501 (BEHR KARL DR [DE], et al) [Y] 7,8 * column 5, lines 55-68 * * column 6, lines 26-36 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 23 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE19909407 (ROSENSTATTER OTTO [AT]) [Y] 9,10 * column 2, lines 44-47 * * column 3, lines 3-6 ** figures 1-3 * |