Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1379068
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
18.08.2006 |
Refusal of application |
published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] |
29.04.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
28.04.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
10.08.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.01.2005 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
07.12.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
07.12.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
10.11.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.08.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2004 |
First examination report |
|
19.05.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.03.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
19.01.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
21.11.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |